THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:40:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Shadlock Street
Unit 1
Endocrinology, Diabetes and Metabolism Institute
Markham Ontario L3S 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-599-5499
Fax: 416-345-0071
Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 203
Endocrinology, Diabetes and Metabolism Institute
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Phone: 416-599-5499
Fax: 416-345-0071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikhil Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gupta (CPSO#: 99049 )
Business Address: Diabetes and Endocrinology Centre
8 Shadlock Street
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L3S 3K9
(416) 599-5499
Business Address: Bramalea Medical Centre
105 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(416) 599-5499

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8 Shadlock Street
Unit 1
Endocrinology, Diabetes and Metabolism Institute
Markham Ontario L3S 3E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-599-5499
Fax: 416-345-0071
Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 203
Endocrinology, Diabetes and Metabolism Institute
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Phone: 416-599-5499
Fax: 416-345-0071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikhil Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Gupta (CPSO#: 99049 )
Business Address: Diabetes and Endocrinology Centre
8 Shadlock Street
Unit 1
Markham Ontario L3S 3K9
(416) 599-5499
Business Address: Bramalea Medical Centre
105 - 18 Kensington Road
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
(416) 599-5499

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nikhil Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology and metabolism in an outpatient setting, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nikhil Gupta may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
endocrinology and metabolism in an outpatient setting, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2012