THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:39:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7330 Yonge St
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Fax: (905) 881-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goldberg (CPSO#: 99066 )
Business Address: 206 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
(905) 889-5926

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7330 Yonge St
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-5926
Fax: (905) 881-6284

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Deborah Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goldberg (CPSO#: 99066 )
Business Address: 206 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L4J 1V8
(905) 889-5926

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH RACHEL GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH RACHEL GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2012