THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:32:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HRH Cancer Centre
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Extension: 21500
Fax: 416-242-1068
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Sudan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sudan (CPSO#: 99118 )
Business Address: HRH Cancer Centre
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HRH Cancer Centre
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Extension: 21500
Fax: 416-242-1068
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905)895-4521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Sudan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sudan (CPSO#: 99118 )
Business Address: HRH Cancer Centre
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAUTAM SUDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GAUTAM SUDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUDAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2012