THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:04:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Kucharski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kucharski (CPSO#: 99126 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
613-737-8010

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Kucharski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kucharski (CPSO#: 99126 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
613-737-8010

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA MARY KUCHARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA MARY KUCHARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2012