THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:49:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Hospital
Borris Gimrac Clinic
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanjot Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sidhu (CPSO#: 99141 )
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Hamilton Ontario L9Y 1P6
(705) 445-0333
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Borris Gimrac Clinic
McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 25 Museum Drive
Hamilton Ontario L3V 7T9
(705) 325-9181
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hamilton Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Hospital
Borris Gimrac Clinic
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amanjot Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sidhu (CPSO#: 99141 )
Business Address: 186 Erie Street
Hamilton Ontario L9Y 1P6
(705) 445-0333
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837
Business Address: Borris Gimrac Clinic
McMaster Hospital
1200 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 25 Museum Drive
Hamilton Ontario L3V 7T9
(705) 325-9181
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Hamilton Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANJOT SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANJOT SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2012