THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:16:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-960 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON M6A 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162567731
Fax: 4167814515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Pirvu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirvu (CPSO#: 99203 )
Business Address: 306-960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A3B5
4162567731

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306-960 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON M6A 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162567731
Fax: 4167814515

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Pirvu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirvu (CPSO#: 99203 )
Business Address: 306-960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M6A3B5
4162567731

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA MIHAELA PIRVU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRVU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA MIHAELA PIRVU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRVU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2012