THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:47:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Emo

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marlon Hagerty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hagerty (CPSO#: 99210 )
Business Address: 895 Lakeshore Dr
Shuniah ON P7A 0S1
Business Address: 895 Lakeshore Dr
Shuniah ON P7A 0S1

Corporation Name: Marlon Hagerty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Emo

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marlon Hagerty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hagerty (CPSO#: 99210 )
Business Address: 895 Lakeshore Dr
Shuniah ON P7A 0S1
Business Address: 895 Lakeshore Dr
Shuniah ON P7A 0S1

Corporation Name: Marlon Hagerty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLON LUKE HAGERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGERTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLON LUKE HAGERTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGERTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2012