THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Room 1 008 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 06 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chacko (CPSO#: 99230 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Room 1 008 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 882-0310

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michaels Hospital
Room 1 008 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 06 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa Chacko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chacko (CPSO#: 99230 )
Business Address: St Michael's Hospital
Room 1 008 Shuter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 882-0310

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE CHACKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE CHACKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2012