THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: (905) 337-0044
Address: LMC Bayview
1929 Bayview Ave #107
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: 8667013636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Abitbol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abitbol (CPSO#: 99232 )
Business Address: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 337-0040
Business Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 107
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 337-0040
Fax: (905) 337-0044
Address: LMC Bayview
1929 Bayview Ave #107
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: 8667013636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Abitbol Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abitbol (CPSO#: 99232 )
Business Address: North Oakville Medical
Suite 301
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 337-0040
Business Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite 107
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ABITBOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABITBOL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ABITBOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABITBOL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2012