THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care London
B3 404
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Shalhoub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shalhoub (CPSO#: 99242 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Care London
B3 404
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 17 Aug 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Shalhoub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shalhoub (CPSO#: 99242 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARAH MOHAMEDSAEED MAHMOUD SHALHOUB may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and Infectious Diseases.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SARAH MOHAMEDSAEED MAHMOUD SHALHOUB may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine and Infectious Diseases.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2012