THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/03/25 22:17:52 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, RUSSIAN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trainyards Medical Centre
550 Terminal Avenue
Unit 22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 731-2244
Fax: (613) 260-4802
Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Neonatology devision
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4267
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ont
Pediatric Endocrinology Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4236
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Pediatric service
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Aug 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zarlasht Amini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Amini (CPSO#: 99256 )
Business Address: Unit 22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
(613) 731-2244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, RUSSIAN, URDU
Medical School: Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trainyards Medical Centre
550 Terminal Avenue
Unit 22
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 731-2244
Fax: (613) 260-4802
Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Neonatology devision
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4267
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ont
Pediatric Endocrinology Clinic
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4236
Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Pediatric service
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 14 Aug 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 14 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zarlasht Amini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Amini (CPSO#: 99256 )
Business Address: Unit 22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
(613) 731-2244

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Sep 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 11 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zarlasht Amini may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zarlasht Amini may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tashkent State Medical Institute, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2012