THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:47:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-3406
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9640
Fax: (905) 336-9628
Address: 2 - 726 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4K1
Phone: 905-575-0777
Fax: 905-575-9800
Address: Extendicare Hamilton
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7S6
Phone: (905) 318-4472
Fax: (905) 318-1162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehulkumar Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 99260 )
Business Address: 2 - 726 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4K1
(905) 575-0777
Business Address: Extendicare Hamilton
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7S6
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 336-9640
Business Address: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 387-0005

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-3406
Fax: (905) 592-2325
Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9640
Fax: (905) 336-9628
Address: 2 - 726 Upper Gage Ave
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4K1
Phone: 905-575-0777
Fax: 905-575-9800
Address: Extendicare Hamilton
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7S6
Phone: (905) 318-4472
Fax: (905) 318-1162

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehulkumar Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 99260 )
Business Address: 2 - 726 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8V 4K1
(905) 575-0777
Business Address: Extendicare Hamilton
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton Ontario L9C 7S6
Business Address: 2951 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7M 4Y1
(905) 336-9640
Business Address: Medica One
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek Ontario L8J 3W2
(905) 387-0005

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Jun 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 06 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MEHULKUMAR PATEL may practise medicine independently in family medicine, low-risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures, and hospitalist medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MEHULKUMAR PATEL may practise medicine independently in family medicine, low-risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures, and hospitalist medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012