THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nir Melamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Melamed (CPSO#: 100989 ) Dr. N. Melamed (CPSO#: 99280 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
M4-140 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 28 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nir Melamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Melamed (CPSO#: 100989 ) Dr. N. Melamed (CPSO#: 99280 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynaecology
M4-140 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3N 3M5
(416) 480-6100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Apr 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 25 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NIR MELAMED may practise medicine independently in Obstetrics and Gynecology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NIR MELAMED may practise medicine independently in Obstetrics and Gynecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Apr 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012