THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:53:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung (CPSO#: 99281 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Emergency Department
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Leung (CPSO#: 99281 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PUI HUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PUI HUNG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012