THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 15:29:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Ave
Geraldton ON P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-1862
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18 Wyandotte Street
Wyandotte Medical and Dental
Orillia Ontario L3V 5M6
Phone: 7053265774
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Stanton Territorial Hospital
550 Byrne Road
Yellowknife NT X1A 2N1
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sauve (CPSO#: 99286 )
Business Address: COLBORNE ST. W
ORILLIA ONTARIO L3V 2Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Ave
Geraldton ON P0T 1M0
Phone: (807) 854-1862
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 18 Wyandotte Street
Wyandotte Medical and Dental
Orillia Ontario L3V 5M6
Phone: 7053265774
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Stanton Territorial Hospital
550 Byrne Road
Yellowknife NT X1A 2N1
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Sauve Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sauve (CPSO#: 99286 )
Business Address: COLBORNE ST. W
ORILLIA ONTARIO L3V 2Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS SAUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUVE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS SAUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUVE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012