THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053207616
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Heaven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Heaven (CPSO#: 99291 )
Business Address: 201-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
7053207616

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7053207616
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Heaven Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Heaven (CPSO#: 99291 )
Business Address: 201-86 Angeline St S
Lindsay ON K9V 6C5
7053207616

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN HEAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAVEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN HEAVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEAVEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cardiff University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012