THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:15:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Clarridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Clarridge (CPSO#: 99294 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8226
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St.
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Clarridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Clarridge (CPSO#: 99294 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
(416) 586-8226
Business Address: Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS EDWARD CHRISTOPHER CLARRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARRIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS EDWARD CHRISTOPHER CLARRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2012