THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 - 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eman Al-Shami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Al-Shami (CPSO#: 99298 )
Business Address: 101 - 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
(905) 272-0165

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 - 3420 Hurontario St
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Fax: (905) 272-4082

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eman Al-Shami Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Al-Shami (CPSO#: 99298 )
Business Address: 101 - 3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga Ontario L5B 4A9
(905) 272-0165

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAN AL-SHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMAN AL-SHAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2012