THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:43:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamed El-Khodary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Khodary (CPSO#: 99328 )
Business Address: 707 Canyon St
Mississauga ON L5H 4M2
6134479977

Corporation Name: Mohamed El-Khodary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Aug 2022

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 34072
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohamed El-Khodary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Khodary (CPSO#: 99328 )
Business Address: 707 Canyon St
Mississauga ON L5H 4M2
6134479977

Corporation Name: Mohamed El-Khodary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Aug 2022

Corporation Name: Boylan, Voss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED IBRAHIM EL-KHODARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KHODARY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED AHMED IBRAHIM EL-KHODARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KHODARY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2012