THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:07:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2300 Eglinton Ave W
203
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058202786
Fax: 9058207863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fatima (CPSO#: 99353 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite #203
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
9058202786

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2300 Eglinton Ave W
203
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058202786
Fax: 9058207863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fatima (CPSO#: 99353 )
Business Address: 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite #203
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
9058202786

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIS FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIS FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2012