THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:22:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-3495 Rebecca St
Oakville ON L6L 0H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-337-7773
Fax: 905-337-1198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangeet Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chahal (CPSO#: 99357 )
Business Address: 106-3495 Rebecca St
Oakville ON L6L 0H5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-3495 Rebecca St
Oakville ON L6L 0H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-337-7773
Fax: 905-337-1198

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mangeet Chahal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chahal (CPSO#: 99357 )
Business Address: 106-3495 Rebecca St
Oakville ON L6L 0H5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANGEET KAUR CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANGEET KAUR CHAHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical College of Ohio at Toledo, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2017
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2012