THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4130 Glenview Avenue, Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: (519) 882-4321
Address: Doctors Walk-In Medical Clinic
641 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2T9
Phone: 519-686-8585
Fax: 519-686-8580
Address: Bluewater Health (CEEH Site)
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-1170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fiddick's Nursing Home
437 First Avenue
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-0370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lambton Meadowview Villa
3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-0590
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Mall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mall (CPSO#: 99366 )
Business Address: 437 First Avenue
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-0370
Business Address: 641 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2T9
(519) 686-8585
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500
Business Address: 4130 Glenview Avenue
Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500
Business Address: 450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4130 Glenview Avenue, Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 882-2500
Fax: (519) 882-4321
Address: Doctors Walk-In Medical Clinic
641 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2T9
Phone: 519-686-8585
Fax: 519-686-8580
Address: Bluewater Health (CEEH Site)
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-1170
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Fiddick's Nursing Home
437 First Avenue
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-0370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lambton Meadowview Villa
3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-0590
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site
LOCATION: Petrolia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Mall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mall (CPSO#: 99366 )
Business Address: 437 First Avenue
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-0370
Business Address: 641 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 2T9
(519) 686-8585
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400
Business Address: 3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500
Business Address: 4130 Glenview Avenue
Unit 3
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-2500
Business Address: 450 Blanche Street
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
(519) 882-4325

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN MALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012