THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:50:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 12 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiac Surgery
Effective: 01 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiac Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 12 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Oct 2024
30 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA LORENA CORAZON V RODRIGUEZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RODRIGUEZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RODRIGUEZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RODRIGUEZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2024, and expires on 30 September, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RODRIGUEZ's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MARIA LORENA CORAZON V RODRIGUEZ may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery, Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. RODRIGUEZ holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RODRIGUEZ no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RODRIGUEZ’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RODRIGUEZ’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 October, 2024, and expires on 30 September, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RODRIGUEZ's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2012