THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:47:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro St
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-7172
Fax: 519-305-6061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Anstett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anstett (CPSO#: 99374 )
Business Address: Hillside Manor Nursing Home
RR #5
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
(519) 393-5132
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 271-7172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro St
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 271-7172
Fax: 519-305-6061

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Anstett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anstett (CPSO#: 99374 )
Business Address: Hillside Manor Nursing Home
RR #5
Stratford Ontario N5A 6S6
(519) 393-5132
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Suite 201
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 271-7172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ANSTETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSTETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE ANSTETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSTETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012