THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:21:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Bramptons Sleep Clinic
106 Humber College Blvd.
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 264 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Sep 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harneet Singh Medical Profressional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 99382 )
Business Address: 202-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 4E4
4167420680

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Etobicoke Bramptons Sleep Clinic
106 Humber College Blvd.
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 264 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 12 Sep 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Missouri

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harneet Singh Medical Profressional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 99382 )
Business Address: 202-106 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 4E4
4167420680

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Oct 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 16 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harneet Singh may practise medicine independently in sleep medicine and
neurology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Harneet Singh may practise medicine independently in sleep medicine and
neurology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2012