THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:02:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132019300
Fax: 6132019301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuchinad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuchinad (CPSO#: 99399 )
Business Address: The Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
(613) 267-1660
Business Address: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132019300
Fax: 6132019301

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuchinad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuchinad (CPSO#: 99399 )
Business Address: The Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth Ontario K7H 3A3
(613) 267-1660
Business Address: 105-9 Eric Devlin Lane
Perth ON K7H 0C4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL KUCHINAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHINAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIL KUCHINAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHINAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012