THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:03:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Hospital-Ajax Campus
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egbewunmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Egbewunmi (CPSO#: 99401 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Hospital-Ajax Campus
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egbewunmi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Egbewunmi (CPSO#: 99401 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley Health System
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
11 Feb 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 11 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Adeyemi Tiwalade Egbewunmi may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Adeyemi Tiwalade Egbewunmi may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 11 Feb 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Sep 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2012