THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universite De Besancon, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CROATIAN, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jelka Lujic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lujic (CPSO#: 99417 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B310
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4169
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, CROATIAN, GERMAN
Medical School: Universite De Besancon, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jelka Lujic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lujic (CPSO#: 99417 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 798-5555
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B310
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4169
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jan 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 30 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jelka-Maria Irma Lujic may practise medicine independently in
anaesthesia, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jelka-Maria Irma Lujic may practise medicine independently in
anaesthesia, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universite De Besancon, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012