THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Welland Site - NHS
65 Third St.
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 33250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Heywood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heywood (CPSO#: 99423 )
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Address: NHS Welland Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 45000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Welland Site - NHS
65 Third St.
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 33250
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Heywood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heywood (CPSO#: 99423 )
Business Address: 5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Address: NHS Welland Site
65 Third Street
Welland Ontario L3B 4W6
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HEYWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYWOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HEYWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEYWOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012