THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:28:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1117
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 30927
Fax: (416) 979-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Rotem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rotem (CPSO#: 99424 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Suite 1117
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 30927

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1117
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 30927
Fax: (416) 979-4996

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amit Rotem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rotem (CPSO#: 99424 )
Business Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Suite 1117
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 30927

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 14 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMIT YOSEF ROTEM may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AMIT YOSEF ROTEM may practise medicine independently in psychiatry and child and adolescent psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012