THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:04:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: Sajid, Saima (Used Until: 27 May 2018)
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Community Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Address: 438 Hughson St N
Hamilton ON L8L 4N5
Phone: 905 523 6611
Fax: 905 523 8735
Address: 9-2275 Britannia Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Phone: 905 567 2525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saima Imtiaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Imtiaz (CPSO#: 99441 )
Business Address: Glen Huron Medical Centre
Suite 4
1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 0C2
Business Address: 438 Hughson St N
Hamilton ON L8L 4N5
905 523 6611 Extn: 2000

General Information

Former Name: Sajid, Saima (Used Until: 27 May 2018)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Compass Community Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-6611
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Address: 438 Hughson St N
Hamilton ON L8L 4N5
Phone: 905 523 6611
Fax: 905 523 8735
Address: 9-2275 Britannia Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 2G6
Phone: 905 567 2525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saima Imtiaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Imtiaz (CPSO#: 99441 )
Business Address: Glen Huron Medical Centre
Suite 4
1 Glenn Hawthorne Boulevard
Mississauga Ontario L5R 0C2
Business Address: 438 Hughson St N
Hamilton ON L8L 4N5
905 523 6611 Extn: 2000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Jan 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 30 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Saima Sajid may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Saima Sajid may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2012