THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:55:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Address: 6981 Millcreek Dr
Unit #2
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Phone: 289-724-7246
Fax: 289-914-2273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.Sardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sardana (CPSO#: 99446 )
Business Address: Winston Park Family Physicians
104 - 2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 829-2826

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Winston Park Family Physicians
2315 Bristol Circle, Suite 104
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Address: 6981 Millcreek Dr
Unit #2
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Phone: 289-724-7246
Fax: 289-914-2273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.Sardana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Sardana (CPSO#: 99446 )
Business Address: Winston Park Family Physicians
104 - 2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
(905) 829-2826

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUN SARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDANA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARUN SARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARDANA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 May 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2012