THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:17:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-7747
Fax: (905) 273-7757
Address: 121-1060 Speers Rd
Oakville Health Centre
Walk-In Clinic
Suite 121
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beata Surma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 28-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-7747
Fax: (905) 273-7757
Address: 121-1060 Speers Rd
Oakville Health Centre
Walk-In Clinic
Suite 121
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beata Surma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Beata Surma may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Beata Surma may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk non-surgical cosmetic procedures.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2012