THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3059A Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134003456
Fax: 613-7010190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Miller (CPSO#: 99453 )
Business Address: 3059A Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 7K4
16134003456

Corporation Name: Sebastian Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3059A Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134003456
Fax: 613-7010190

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 25 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sebastian Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Miller (CPSO#: 99453 )
Business Address: 3059A Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K2B 7K4
16134003456

Corporation Name: Sebastian Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN JOHN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN JOHN MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2012