THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 446 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-547-3901
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Dao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dao (CPSO#: 99467 )
Business Address: 446 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 1C2
905-547-3901

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 446 Concession St
Hamilton ON L9A 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-547-3901
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Dao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dao (CPSO#: 99467 )
Business Address: 446 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 1C2
905-547-3901

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUNG VAN DAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUNG VAN DAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2012