THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Lemeshko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Lemeshko (CPSO#: 99475 )
Business Address: 2319 Guildstone Cres
Oakville ON L6M 3Y8

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Lemeshko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 844-3281
Fax: (905) 849-1076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Lemeshko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Lemeshko (CPSO#: 99475 )
Business Address: 2319 Guildstone Cres
Oakville ON L6M 3Y8

Corporation Name: Dr. Olga Lemeshko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTORIVNA LEMESHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMESHKO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA VIKTORIVNA LEMESHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEMESHKO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dniepropetrovsk State Medical Academy, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012