THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duggan (CPSO#: 99485 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811
Business Address: 33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Duggan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duggan (CPSO#: 99485 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
(613) 732-2811
Business Address: 33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
(613) 267-1500
Business Address: 60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
(613) 283-2330

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL ROBERT DUGGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012