THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
PO Box 10
Virgil Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-468-3275
Fax: 905-468-7960

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Durocher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Durocher (CPSO#: 99486 )
Business Address: 7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
(289) 477-6011
Business Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(905) 374-3344
Business Address: 318 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
(905) 682-0444
Business Address: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
P O Box 10
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
(905) 468-3275

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
PO Box 10
Virgil Ontario L0S 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-468-3275
Fax: 905-468-7960

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jan 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Durocher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Durocher (CPSO#: 99486 )
Business Address: 7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6S5
(289) 477-6011
Business Address: 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
(905) 374-3344
Business Address: 318 Ontario Street
St Catharines Ontario L2R 5L8
(905) 682-0444
Business Address: 1882 Niagara Stone Road
P O Box 10
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
(905) 468-3275

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ROSS DUROCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUROCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ROSS DUROCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUROCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012