THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:32:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-7100
Fax: (519) 974-7672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh, ON
N8N 3T6
Phone: 519-956-8867
Fax: 519-956-8317
Date Received: 06 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rukavina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rukavina (CPSO#: 99489 )
Business Address: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
(519) 974-7100
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 956-8867

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CROATIAN
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-7100
Fax: (519) 974-7672

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Oct 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh, ON
N8N 3T6
Phone: 519-956-8867
Fax: 519-956-8317
Date Received: 06 Sep 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Rukavina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rukavina (CPSO#: 99489 )
Business Address: 6038 Empress Street
Windsor Ontario N8T 1B5
(519) 974-7100
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5111
Business Address: 13126 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 956-8867

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN RUKAVINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUKAVINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN RUKAVINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUKAVINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012