THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stoney Creek Family Medicine Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
London, ON
N5X0H7
London Ontario N5X 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lucas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lucas (CPSO#: 99516 )
Business Address: Stoney Creek Family Medicine Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X 0H7
(519) 679-1717

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Stoney Creek Family Medicine Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
London, ON
N5X0H7
London Ontario N5X 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 679-1717
Fax: (519) 679-1716

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lucas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lucas (CPSO#: 99516 )
Business Address: Stoney Creek Family Medicine Clinic
770 South Wenige Drive
London Ontario N5X 0H7
(519) 679-1717

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM CHARLES KEITH LUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUCAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM CHARLES KEITH LUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUCAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2012