THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:55:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus, Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
Division of Pediatrics
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 57341
Fax: (519) 685-8105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ashok (CPSO#: 99529 )
Business Address: London Health Science Centre-Victoria Campus
Division of Pediatrics
Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8792

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL, TELUGU
Medical School: University of Madras, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus, Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
Division of Pediatrics
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Extension: 57341
Fax: (519) 685-8105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Gastroenterology
Effective: 09 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ashok (CPSO#: 99529 )
Business Address: London Health Science Centre-Victoria Campus
Division of Pediatrics
Suite B1-166
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8792

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DHANDAPANI ASHOK may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics and Pediatric gastroenterology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. DHANDAPANI ASHOK may practise medicine independently in Pediatrics and Pediatric gastroenterology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012