THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Alder Crescent
P.O. Box 1808
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135843398
Fax: 613-670-8833
Address: Deep River & District Hospital
117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 6135843333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ceponis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ceponis (CPSO#: 99531 )

Corporation Name: Peter Ceponis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jun 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Alder Crescent
P.O. Box 1808
Deep River Ontario K0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135843398
Fax: 613-670-8833
Address: Deep River & District Hospital
117 Banting Dr
Deep River ON K0J 1P0
Phone: 6135843333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ceponis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ceponis (CPSO#: 99531 )

Corporation Name: Peter Ceponis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Jun 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JONATHAN MCALEA CEPONIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEPONIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER JONATHAN MCALEA CEPONIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CEPONIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2012