THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:41:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King St W
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yuliya Knyahnytska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Knyahnytska (CPSO#: 99533 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 752 King St W
Providence Care Hospital
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-4900
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yuliya Knyahnytska Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Knyahnytska (CPSO#: 99533 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
13 Apr 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 13 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YULIYA OLEKSANDRIVNA KNYAHNYTSKA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. YULIYA OLEKSANDRIVNA KNYAHNYTSKA may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: BUKOVINIAN STATE MEDICAL ACADEMY, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 05 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 May 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2012