THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:52:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 3359
Fax: 647-788-4394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez (CPSO#: 99543 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 3359

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 3359
Fax: 647-788-4394

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lopez de Lara Gutierrez (CPSO#: 99543 )
Business Address: Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
3560 Bathurst Street
Suite 4W02C
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
(416) 785-2500 Extn: 3359

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATALINA LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATALINA LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOPEZ DE LARA GUTIERREZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma de Guadalajara, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012