THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:10:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MARATHI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 King St E
Sacntuary
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197454404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jyothi Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 )
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 508-7029
Business Address: 200 University Avenue West
Health service campus
University of waterloo campus
200 university avenue west
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3G1
5198884567 Extn: 31960

Corporation Name: Ram Gobburu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 ) Dr. R. Gobburu (CPSO#: 99011 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, MARATHI, TELUGU
Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 310 King St E
Sacntuary
Kitchener ON N2G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197454404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jyothi Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 )
Business Address: 444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 508-7029
Business Address: 200 University Avenue West
Health service campus
University of waterloo campus
200 university avenue west
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3G1
5198884567 Extn: 31960

Corporation Name: Ram Gobburu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 ) Dr. R. Gobburu (CPSO#: 99011 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JYOTHI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JYOTHI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2012