THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:32:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Columbia University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Juravinski Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
711 Concession Street A3-77
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43566
Fax: (905) 389-0108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 31 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eva Piessens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Piessens (CPSO#: 99577 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42111
Business Address: HHS Juravinski Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-77
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43566

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Columbia University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Juravinski Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
711 Concession Street A3-77
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43566
Fax: (905) 389-0108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 31 Oct 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eva Piessens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Piessens (CPSO#: 99577 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 42111
Business Address: HHS Juravinski Hospital
Division of Infectious Diseases
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-77
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43566

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Aug 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 15 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eva Angele Piessens may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Eva Angele Piessens may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Columbia University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Feb 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012