THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7254070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amisha Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamath (CPSO#: 99587 )
Business Address: 450 Westheights Drive
Suite 11
Kitchener Ontario N2N 1Y8
(519) 725-4070

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11-450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2N 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 7254070
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amisha Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kamath (CPSO#: 99587 )
Business Address: 450 Westheights Drive
Suite 11
Kitchener Ontario N2N 1Y8
(519) 725-4070

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Sep 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 02 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amisha Thulasidas Kamath may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amisha Thulasidas Kamath may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2012