THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 13:23:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Science Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 6846001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Kisselgoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kisselgoff (CPSO#: 99590 ) Dr. D. Kisselgoff (CPSO#: 86973 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Science Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 6846001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Kisselgoff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kisselgoff (CPSO#: 99590 ) Dr. D. Kisselgoff (CPSO#: 86973 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA ALEKSANDROVNA KISSELGOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISSELGOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLGA ALEKSANDROVNA KISSELGOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KISSELGOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Chelyabinsk State Medical Academy, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Nov 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012