THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Anthireya Kakani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anthireya-Kakani (CPSO#: 99607 )
Business Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TAMIL
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Anthireya Kakani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Anthireya-Kakani (CPSO#: 99607 )
Business Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA ANTHIREYA-KAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTHIREYA-KAKANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOPHIA ANTHIREYA-KAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTHIREYA-KAKANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2012