THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-250 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 3415
Fax: 8336409770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manjula Balasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balasundaram (CPSO#: 99611 )
Business Address: 14-250 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3T7
2266260961
Business Address: 5 - 1534 Queensbury Crescent
Oakville Ontario L6H 4G5
(905) 845-3415

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 14-250 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 3415
Fax: 8336409770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manjula Balasundaram Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Balasundaram (CPSO#: 99611 )
Business Address: 14-250 Wyecroft Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3T7
2266260961
Business Address: 5 - 1534 Queensbury Crescent
Oakville Ontario L6H 4G5
(905) 845-3415

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANJULA BALASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANJULA BALASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Madras Medical College, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2012